House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {483621/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443228/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |