House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {363122/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {843820/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/29/2021 | Pre-filed |