Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {453521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |