Senate | 04/11/2022 | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D. Barnes, C. Branch and Patterson) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Elfreth, Young and Eckardt) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Senate Refuses Recede | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | House Requests Senate Recede | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443829/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |