House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |