House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {133625/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 01/17/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |