House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (95-37) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {843226/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Floor Amendment {823825/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Third Reading Passed (101-30) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Adams) Adopted | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {943128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |