House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {863228/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {553027/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Economic Matters |