House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-10) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (95-40) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {613326/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |