House | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {283227/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 10/28/2021 | Pre-filed |