Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (101-32) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |