House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {373029/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {823227/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |