House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |