House | 04/01/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {423124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |