House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |