House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (97-42) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |