House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-2) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |