House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-3) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713920/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |