House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {103027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-7) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {243426/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |