House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (41-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |