House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |