House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed 47-0 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {113524/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 08/16/2021 | Pre-filed |