Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB422 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb0422*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 422
88 Q3 2lr0146
99 CF 2lr0145
1010 By: The Speaker (By Request – Administration) and Delegates Anderton, Boteler,
1111 Chisholm, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Kipke, Kittleman,
1212 Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Munoz, Novotny, Otto, Reilly,
1313 Saab, Szeliga, Thiam, and Wivell
1414 Introduced and read first time: January 19, 2022
1515 Assigned to: Ways and Means
1616
1717 A BILL ENTITLED
1818
1919 AN ACT concerning 1
2020
2121 Working Marylanders Tax Relief Act of 2022 2
2222
2323 FOR the purpose of altering, beginning with a certain taxable year, the percentage of the 3
2424 federal earned income tax credit used for determining the amount that an individual 4
2525 may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income tax credit under certain 5
2626 circumstances; and generally relating to the Maryland earned income tax credit. 6
2727
2828 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7
2929 Article – Tax – General 8
3030 Section 10–704 9
3131 Annotated Code of Maryland 10
3232 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 11
3333
3434 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 12
3535 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 13
3636
3737 Article – Tax – General 14
3838
3939 10–704. 15
4040
4141 (a) In this section, “taxpayer” means: 16
4242
4343 (1) an individual filing an income tax return; or 17
4444
4545 (2) a married couple filing a joint income tax return. 18
4646 2 HOUSE BILL 422
4747
4848
4949 (b) (1) A resident who is a taxpayer may claim a credit against the State 1
5050 income tax for a taxable year in the amount determined under subsection (c) of this section 2
5151 for earned income. 3
5252
5353 (2) A resident who is a taxpayer may claim a credit against the county 4
5454 income tax for a taxable year in the amount determined under subsection (d) of this section 5
5555 for earned income. 6
5656
5757 (c) (1) Except as provided in paragraphs (2) and (3) of this subsection and 7
5858 subject to subsection (e) of this section, the credit allowed against the State income tax 8
5959 under subsection (b)(1) of this section is the lesser of: 9
6060
6161 (i) 50% of the earned income credit allowable for the taxable year 10
6262 under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code or that would have been allowable but for the 11
6363 limitation under § 32(m) of the Internal Revenue Code; or 12
6464
6565 (ii) the State income tax for the taxable year. 13
6666
6767 (2) (i) Subject to subparagraph (iii) of this paragraph and subsection (e) 14
6868 of this section, a resident may claim a refund in the amount, if any, by which the applicable 15
6969 percentage specified in subparagraph (ii) of this paragraph of the earned income credit 16
7070 allowable for the taxable year under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code exceeds the State 17
7171 income tax for the taxable year. 18
7272
7373 (ii) Subject to subparagraph (iii) of this paragraph, the applicable 19
7474 percentage of the earned income credit allowable under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code 20
7575 to be used for purposes of determining the refund provided under this paragraph is: 21
7676
7777 1. 25% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2013, 22
7878 but before January 1, 2015; 23
7979
8080 2. 25.5% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 24
8181 2014, but before January 1, 2016; 25
8282
8383 3. 26% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2015, 26
8484 but before January 1, 2017; 27
8585
8686 4. 27% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2016, 28
8787 but before January 1, 2018; 29
8888
8989 5. 28% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2017, 30
9090 but before January 1, 2020; AND 31
9191
9292 6. 45% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 32
9393 2019[, but before January 1, 2023; and 33
9494 HOUSE BILL 422 3
9595
9696
9797 7. 28% for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 1
9898 2022]. 2
9999
100100 (iii) For purposes of determining the refund provided under this 3
101101 paragraph, the earned income credit allowable under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code is 4
102102 calculated without regard to the limitation under § 32(m) of the Internal Revenue Code. 5
103103
104104 (3) (i) For purposes of this section for an individual without a qualifying 6
105105 child, the credit allowable for a taxable year under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code is 7
106106 calculated without regard to: 8
107107
108108 1. the minimum age requirement under § 32(c)(1)(A)(ii)(II) of 9
109109 the Internal Revenue Code; or 10
110110
111111 2. the limitation under § 32(m) of the Internal Revenue Code. 11
112112
113113 (ii) Subject to subparagraph (iii) of this paragraph, for a taxable year 12
114114 beginning after December 31, 2019[, but before January 1, 2023], the credit allowed against 13
115115 the State income tax under subsection (b)(1) of this section for an individual without a 14
116116 qualifying child is equal to 100% of the earned income credit allowable for a taxable year 15
117117 under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code. 16
118118
119119 (iii) The tax credit allowed under this paragraph may not exceed $530 17
120120 for a taxable year. 18
121121
122122 (iv) If the tax credit allowed under this paragraph in any taxable year 19
123123 exceeds the total tax otherwise payable by the individual without a qualifying child for that 20
124124 taxable year, the individual may claim a refund in the amount of the excess. 21
125125
126126 (d) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2) of this subsection and subject to 22
127127 subsection (e) of this section, the credit allowed against the county income tax under 23
128128 subsection (b)(2) of this section is the lesser of: 24
129129
130130 (i) the earned income credit allowable for the taxable year under § 25
131131 32 of the Internal Revenue Code or that would have been allowable but for the limitation 26
132132 under § 32(m) of the Internal Revenue Code multiplied by 10 times the county income tax 27
133133 rate for the taxable year; or 28
134134
135135 (ii) the county income tax for the taxable year. 29
136136
137137 (2) (i) A county may provide, by law, for a refundable county earned 30
138138 income credit as provided in this paragraph. 31
139139
140140 (ii) If a county provides for a refundable county earned income credit 32
141141 under this paragraph, on or before July 1 prior to the beginning of the first taxable year for 33
142142 which it is applicable, the county shall give the Comptroller notice of the refundable county 34
143143 earned income credit. 35 4 HOUSE BILL 422
144144
145145
146146
147147 (iii) If a county provides for a refundable county earned income credit 1
148148 under this paragraph, a resident may claim a refund of the amount, if any, by which the 2
149149 product of multiplying the credit allowable for the taxable year under § 32 of the Internal 3
150150 Revenue Code or that would have been allowable but for the limitation under § 32(m) of 4
151151 the Internal Revenue Code by 5 times the county income tax rate for the taxable year 5
152152 exceeds the county income tax for the taxable year. 6
153153
154154 (iv) The amount of any refunds payable under a refundable county 7
155155 earned income credit operates to reduce the income tax revenue from individuals 8
156156 attributable to the county income tax for that county. 9
157157
158158 (e) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, for an individual who is a 10
159159 resident of the State for only a part of the year, the amount of the credit or refund allowed 11
160160 under this section shall be determined based on the part of the earned income credit 12
161161 allowable for the taxable year under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code that is attributable 13
162162 to Maryland, determined by multiplying the federal earned income credit by a fraction: 14
163163
164164 (i) the numerator of which is the Maryland adjusted gross income of 15
165165 the individual; and 16
166166
167167 (ii) the denominator of which is the federal adjusted gross income of 17
168168 the individual. 18
169169
170170 (2) For purposes of determining the amount of the credit or refund under 19
171171 paragraph (1) of this subsection, the part of the earned income credit allowable for the 20
172172 taxable year under § 32 of the Internal Revenue Code is calculated without regard to the 21
173173 limitation under § 32(m) of the Internal Revenue Code. 22
174174
175175 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 23
176176 1, 2022. 24
177177
178178