House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (38-5) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (92-37) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |