House
|
04/09/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {873229/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-89)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {383128/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-88)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {433825/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (49-83)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {323621/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (44-87)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Floor Amendment {723121/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (50-80)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Favorable Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|