House | 04/01/2022 | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar) | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Requests Senate Recede | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (34-12) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Floor Amendment {823520/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Augustine) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (102-35) | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {203626/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/30/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |