House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {963123/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {663923/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |