House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (102-28) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |