House | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (114-24) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {903026/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | First Reading Appropriations |