House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hough) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {903428/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |