Maryland 2022 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB47 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/22/2021

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0047*  
  
HOUSE BILL 47 
F1   	2lr0708 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF 2lr0369 
By: Delegate Wilson 
Requested: October 8, 2021 
Introduced and read first time: January 12, 2022 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Public Schools – Expanded American History – Development of Content 2 
Standards and Implementation 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the State Board of Education to develop content standards 4 
for expanded American history to be included in certain State standards for social 5 
studies; requiring each county board of education, in collaboration with the local 6 
school system, to develop and implement certain curriculum guides for expanded 7 
American history; requiring each public school to include expanded American history 8 
in the social studies curriculum beginning in a certain school year; requiring the 9 
State Department of Education and the State Board of Education to jointly analyze 10 
certain content standards for expanded American history; and generally relating to 11 
the development and implementation of an expanded American history curriculum 12 
in public schools.  13 
 
BY adding to 14 
 Article – Education 15 
Section 7–205.5 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20 
 
Article – Education 21 
 
7–205.5. 22 
 
 (A) (1) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2022, THE STATE BOARD SHALL 23 
DEVELOP CONTENT STAN DARDS FOR EXP ANDED AMERICAN HISTORY TO B E 24  2 	HOUSE BILL 47  
 
 
INCLUDED IN THE STATE STANDARDS AND FRAMEWORKS IN SOCIAL STUDIES. 1 
 
 (2) THE CONTENT STANDARDS FOR EXPANDED AMERICAN HISTORY 2 
SHALL INCLUDE INSTRU CTION ON THE HISTORY AND CONTRIBUTIONS OF THE 3 
FOLLOWING GROUPS : 4 
 
 (I) AFRICAN AMERICANS; 5 
 
 (II) AMERICAN INDIANS; 6 
 
 (III) ASIAN AMERICANS AND PACIFIC ISLANDERS; 7 
 
 (IV) HISPANIC AMERICANS; 8 
 
 (V) WOMEN; AND 9 
 
 (VI) OTHER GROUPS AS DETER MINED BY THE STATE BOARD. 10 
 
 (B) EACH COUNTY BOARD , IN COLLABORATION WIT H THE LOCAL SCHOOL 11 
SYSTEM, SHALL DEVELOP AND IM PLEMENT AGE –APPROPRIATE CURRICUL UM 12 
GUIDES FOR EXPANDED AMERICAN HISTORY SUBJ ECT TO THE CONTENT 13 
STANDARDS ESTABLISHE D UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION. 14 
 
 (C) BEGINNING IN THE 2023–2024 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH PUBLIC SCHOOL I N 15 
THE STATE SHALL INCLUDE E XPANDED AMERICAN HISTORY IN T HE SOCIAL STUDIES 16 
CURRICULUM .  17 
 
 (D) THE STATE BOARD MAY ADOPT REGUL ATIONS TO IMPLEMENT THE 18 
REQUIREMENTS OF THIS SECTION. 19 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 20 
 
 (a) The State Department of Education and the State Board of Education jointly 21 
shall analyze content standards for expanded American history included in the State 22 
Standards and Frameworks in Social Studies of the Maryland College and Career 23 
Readiness Standards, including the content standards for each grade level. 24 
 
 (b) On or before October 1, 2023, the State Department of Education and the State 25 
Board of Education jointly shall report to the General Assembly, in accordance with §  26 
2–1257 of the State Government Article, on the analysis conducted under subsection (a) of 27 
this section. 28 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 29 
1, 2022. 30   	HOUSE BILL 47 	3