House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 11/01/2021 | Pre-filed |