House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |