House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (31-16) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {323623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |