House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {923228/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |