House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (112-27) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {683829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |