Senate | 04/08/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513428/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |