House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740 | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-1) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {373020/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |