House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |