Senate | 04/09/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {213928/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |