House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |