House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed 47-0 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {523729/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |