House | 04/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {533228/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |