House | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408 | ||
House | 04/01/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion Reconsider the Vote by which the Bill was made a Special Order (Senator King) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Griffith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (121-8) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {393320/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
House | 02/04/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |