House | 03/18/2022 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary) | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary |