House | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (108-30) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {513527/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Judiciary |