Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {603328/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |