House
|
04/09/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (97-26)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {483926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {143828/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {373023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|