Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {353729/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First Reading Ways and Means |