House | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543 | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (106-23) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {983221/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 01/07/2022 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Pre-filed |